Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Targeted Areas
Sponsored by
Delegate Hornberger
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to procure, on or before June 30, 2018, the services of at least one eligible fund manager that is based in specified targeted areas surrounding a video lottery facility for purposes of the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account; requiring the Board to report specified information to the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2018, under specified circumstances; requiring that specified funds in the Account be allocated in a certain manner to certain targeted areas; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Video Lottery Facilities - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Targeted Areas
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM