Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Due Process Hearings
Sponsored by
Delegates Braveboy, Bates, Carr, Frush, Hixson, Ivey, Kach, A. Kelly, McMillan, A. Miller, W. Miller, Mizeur, B. Robinson, Schulz, Valderrama, Vaughn, and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Stating the goal of the General Assembly that a specified parent of a child with a disability and specified public agencies mediate specified issues before filing a due process complaint with the Office of Administrative Hearings; requiring specified public agencies to provide a parent of a child with a disability with specified information relating to requesting documents under specified circumstances; altering the duties of the Commission on Special Education Access and Equity; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0779
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {305367/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Braveboy) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Braveboy) {243423/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {305367/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate Braveboy) Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Braveboy) {243423/1 Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM