Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State and Local Retirement and Pension Systems - Assignment of Benefits to Trust for Disabled Individuals
Sponsored by
Delegates Smigiel, Cluster, Hough, McDermott, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the assignment of a retirement or pension allowance from the State Retirement and Pension System or a local retirement or pension system to a specified type of trust for the benefit of specified individuals who are disabled, as defined under federal law; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to adopt regulations; requiring the board of trustees for a local retirement or pension system to adopt rules or regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0403
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2014 3/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-402, 21-502.1, 37.5-101, 37.5-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM