Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Certified Professional Midwives - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Kelly, Afzali, Beidle, Carr, Cullison, George, Gutierrez, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hough, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Kaiser, Kipke, Luedtke, Mizeur, Parrott, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Stein, Stocksdale, V. Turner, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certified professional midwives to practice in the State if the certified professional midwife is certified to practice by the North American Registry of Midwives and by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; requiring certified professional midwives to file birthing plans with the Department that include prenatal counseling, preparation for an emergency, identification of an accessible hospital in the event of an emergency, and the filing of the result of the delivery and a birth certificate; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101 through 6-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM