Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Income and Property Tax Credits - Privately Operated Mass Transportation Project
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Valentino-Smith, Pena-Melnyk, B. Barnes, Fennell, Healey, Malone, Proctor, and Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain businesses impacted by the construction of a privately operated mass transportation project a credit against the State income tax and State property tax; requiring a person constructing a privately operated mass transportation project to file a certain plan with certain county governments; requiring the Department to certify a business entity as a qualified business if the business entity can establish loss of business income at a property in the area impacted by the construction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Income and Property Tax Credits - Privately Operated Mass Transportation Project
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM