Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Atrazine Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Ebersole, Gutierrez, Lam, Moon, Morhaim, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in cooperation with the Department of the Environment and the Department of Agriculture, to study and make recommendations regarding the impact of atrazine in the State; specifying the parameters of the study; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to report the findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2018, and to make the report available to the public on its Web site.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0932
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Atrazine Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Atrazine Study
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM