Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Access of Students to Emergency Contraception
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Hettleman, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Haynes, Hill, Kaiser, Korman, Krimm, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Platt, Queen, Reznik, Tarlau, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a public institution of higher education to require a student health center to provide during the regular hours of operation of the student health center on-site access to specified emergency contraception and contraceptive counseling or referrals for contraceptive counseling to other qualified health care providers; requiring a public institution of higher education to ensure the availability of specified emergency contraception at all times; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Access of Students to Emergency Contraception
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM