Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Arora, Carter, Cullison, Hixson, Hucker, Ivey, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lee, A. Miller, Mizeur, Reznik, S. Robinson, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the number of registered voters used to determine the number of early voting centers that must be established in a county; altering the number of early voting centers a county with 450,000 or more registered voters is required to establish; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2013 Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM