Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Division of Labor and Industry - Youth Apprenticeship Advisory Committee
Sponsored by
Delegate Simmons
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Youth Apprenticeship Advisory Committee in the Division of Labor and Industry; providing for the composition and duties of the Committee; requiring the Committee to submit a report to the General Assembly on or before December 1 of each year regarding any recommended legislation to promote high school youth apprenticeship programs in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183293/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {277974/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {183293/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Finance 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {277974/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM