Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Krimm, Lierman, Morales, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the placement of more than two children in a treatment foster care home in order to place siblings together if the local department makes a written finding that placing the siblings together is in their best interests and that the siblings will not harm other children placed at the same treatment foster care home; and requiring the local department to notify the Social Services Administration of the Department of Human Resources of the placement.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0085
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {322312/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798877/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {322312/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {798877/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-525.2 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:33 AM