Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mobile Carrying Device - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates Wells, Acevero, Attar, Boyce, Bridges, Charkoudian, Fraser-Hidalgo, Holmes, Korman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Love, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Smith, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "mobile carrying device" for purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law; and altering a certain definition to specify that a mobile carrying device is not a vehicle for purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Mobile Carrying Device - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Mobile Carrying Device - Definition
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-133.1, 11-176 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM