Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options
Sponsored by
Delegates Swain, Braveboy, Carter, Harper, Oaks, B. Robinson, Valderrama, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified school principals from suspending specified students or recommending specified students for expulsion unless the student commits a specified act or a specified offense under specified circumstances; requiring specified principals to use specified alternative disciplinary options in lieu of suspensions unless the student committed a specified act or a specified offense; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0866
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-319, 7-305, 7-305.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM