Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Health and Safety - Food Transparency
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Carr, Fennell, Lam, A. Miller, S. Robinson, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified local school systems to create specified dining menus; requiring a specified dining menu to include specified information under specified circumstances; requiring specified local school systems to post specified information on the local school system's Web site; requiring specified public schools to provide a specified link on the public school's Web site under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0278
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-437 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM