Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Job Reinvestment Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for certain small business entities located in an enterprise zone or a Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise (RISE) zone; allowing a small business to qualify for the credit if the business hired and retained at least one new employee for at least 6 months; allowing a small business to apply the credit for each employee who is hired that results in a net increase in the number of employees hired and retained by the business; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0810
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018, July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Job Reinvestment Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Job Reinvestment Act of 2018
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1406, 5-707 )
(   10-746 )
(   9-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM