Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telehealth - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Shetty, Acevero, Atterbeary, Bartlett, Carr, D.M. Davis, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Korman, Ruth, Saab, Solomon, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to apply, on or before December 1, 2020, to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for an amendment to certain waivers to implement a pilot program to provide certain telehealth services to recipients under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; limiting the telehealth services available under the pilot program; requiring the Department to administer the pilot program under certain circumstances; terminating the Act after June 30, 2025; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telehealth - Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telehealth - Pilot Program
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-141.2 )
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 8:48 AM