Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Health and Safety - School Wellness Committees
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Carr, Fennell, Lam, A. Miller, S. Robinson, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to establish a specified wellness committee to discuss issues relating to the physical, mental, and social health and well-being of students and make specified recommendations; providing for the membership of specified wellness committees; requiring each meeting of specified wellness committees to be open to the public and to provide opportunity for public comment; and authorizing each county board to adopt specified regulations.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0506
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-437 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM