Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments
Sponsored by
Delegates Swain and V. Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to conduct a cumulative impact assessment before preparing a tentative determination on specified permit applications; requiring a cumulative impact assessment to address the likely impact on the environment and on human populations that will result from specified incremental impacts; authorizing the Department to take specified actions with respect to a permit on the basis of a cumulative impact assessment conducted under the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0706
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-604, 1-901 through 1-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM