Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Kelly, Afzali, Anderson, Beidle, Boteler, Carr, Cullison, George, Glass, Guzzone, Hogan, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Kipke, Krebs, Luedtke, McMillan, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Parrott, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Stein, Stocksdale, V. Turner, Valderrama, Vitale, M. Washington, and Weir
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a licensing and regulation scheme for the practice of traditional midwifery under the State Board of Nursing; requiring licensed midwives to obtain specified documents, make specified assurances, inform mothers of specified options, and refer, transfer, and transport clients to health care facilities and health care practitioners under specified circumstances; establishing the Midwifery Advisory Committee; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-6C-01 through 8-6C-31 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM