Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Modification of Orders
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone and McMillan
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of the Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act establishing that a tribunal of this State that has issued a certain child support order has and shall exercise continuing, exclusive jurisdiction to modify its child support order under certain circumstances, even if this State is not the residence of the obligor, the obligee, or the child for whose benefit the support order is issued.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Modification of Orders
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page