Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of the Environment, Department of Transportation, and State Highway Administration - Permits With Impact Studies - Hearings
Sponsored by
Delegates Bagnall, Arikan, Boyce, Chang, Crosby, Cullison, Gilchrist, Holmes, Howard, Johnson, Kipke, Lehman, Lierman, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Solomon, Stewart, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment, the Department of Transportation, and the State Highway Administration from holding a certain public hearing on a certain permit or issuing a certain permit unless a certain public hearing is held; requiring the public hearing to be located within 10 miles of the site for which a permit is being sought; and requiring certain State agencies and local jurisdictions to attend the public hearing and be available to answer certain questions.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Department of the Environment, Department of Transportation, and State Highway Administration - Permits With Impact Studies - Hearings
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   1-6A-01, 1-6A-02 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page