Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of Damages
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Wilson
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Extending the statute of limitations from within 7 years to 32 of the date that the victim attains the age of majority in specified civil actions relating to child sexual abuse; providing that a specified statute of limitations does not apply during a specified period for a person with a certificate of merit obtained from the person's attorney and a licensed psychiatrist or psychologist; requiring information in a certificate of merit for specified civil actions relating to child sexual abuse to be provided by specified people; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0858 Session: 2008 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015, February 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM