Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Therapists - Licensure
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Barron, Krebs, McCray, Moon, Platt, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Dental Examiners to adopt regulations for the licensure of dental therapists and the practice of dental therapy; requiring the Board to adopt regulations establishing criteria for taking specified action relating to a collaboration agreement; requiring the Board to adopt a code of ethics for the practice of dental therapy; requiring the Board to set specified fees and to pay all fees collected to the Comptroller; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1013
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Dental Therapists - Licensure
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Dental Therapists - Licensure
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-6A-01 through 4-6A-24 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM