Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Crimes Against Property – Right to Defend Property (Castle Doctrine)
Sponsored by
Delegates Cox, Adams, Anderson, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Buckel, Chisholm, Corderman, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Parrott, Pippy, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that an occupant of a dwelling is justified in using any degree of physical force against another person when the other person has made an unlawful entry into the dwelling, the occupant reasonably believes that force or deadly force is necessary to repel an attack by the other person, and the amount and nature of the force used by the occupant is reasonable under the circumstances; establishing that a person acting in accordance with the Act is immune from certain criminal prosecution; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law – Crimes Against Property – Right to Defend Property (Castle Doctrine)
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM