Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Preparation Expansion Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a student or a student's parent or guardian to release the student's Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery score to certain apprenticeship programs and certain employers; authorizing the State Department of Education to adopt regulations requiring the award of credit toward high school graduation for time spent in certain apprenticeship programs; authorizing a Workforce Development Sequence Scholarship to assist with the cost of participation in certain apprenticeship programs; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0978
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career Preparation Expansion Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233991/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Career Preparation Expansion Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-12)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Career Preparation Expansion Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Text - First - Career Preparation Expansion Act
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {233991/1 Adopted 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Text - Third - Career Preparation Expansion Act
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (126-12) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Referred Rules 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Adopted 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Second Reading Passed 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694
Text - Chapter - Career Preparation Expansion Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1401 through 11-1406, 18-3301, 18-3302, 18-3303, 18-3304, 21-205, 24-702, 7-111, 7-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM