Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Licensing
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington, Barron, Bridges, Fennell, W. Fisher, and Glenn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing an exemption for certain check cashing services from the requirement to be licensed; increasing the license fee for a check cashing service; providing for the payment of the fee into certain funds; establishing the Financial Awareness Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; providing for the administration of the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; requiring a certain licensee to post a certain notice; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Licensing
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-610, 12-102, 12-105, 12-108, 12-108.1, 12-118 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM