Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Specialty Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Services - Parity
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Angel, Cullison, Hayes, Haynes, Hill, Jacobs, Kelly, Krimm, Lam, Oaks, Otto, Patterson, Reznik, Tarlau, Turner, Queen, Hammen, Barron, Bromwell, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations to ensure that the Maryland Medical Assistance Program is in compliance with specified federal laws; providing that the Department is not required to adopt specified regulations for any changes that may be made through a process other than the regulatory process; requiring the regulations to include standards regarding treatment limitations for specialty mental health and substance use disorder services that comply with the federal laws; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0899
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {956682/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {956682/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Finance 47A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-103.6 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM