Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Clippinger, R. Lewis, Pendergrass, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining the term "splash pad" to mean an outdoor play area with sprinklers, fountains, nozzles, or other devices or structures that spray water and in which water is not allowed to accumulate and that is not used for submersion of the human body; and authorizing the governing body of a county to adopt and enforce rules and regulations to govern the sanitary condition of splash pads and any sanitary feature connected to a splash pad.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0924
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {866188/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {866188/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Text - Chapter - Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM