Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Financial Conditions
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Angel, Hill, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Robinson, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a court in a county with a pretrial supervision program from including as a condition of pretrial release a specified financial condition; requiring each county in the State to establish a pretrial supervision program that provides pretrial supervision services, including agent supervision, location tracking services, and reminder notifications for court appearances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017, December 31, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Financial Conditions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Financial Conditions
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-201, 5-202, 5-203, 5-204, 5-205, 5-207, 5-211, 5-214 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM