Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger and Queen
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, from 15 years to 20 years, the time period that certain inmates sentenced to life imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 2020, must serve before becoming eligible for parole consideration; repealing certain provisions that provide that inmates serving a term of life imprisonment may be paroled only with the Governor's approval, subject to certain provisions; repealing certain provisions that require certain parole decisions to be transmitted to the Governor under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0817
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {723424/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (39-93)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-38)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 46
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Floor Amendment {723424/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (39-93) 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (89-38) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-305, 7-301 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:25 PM