Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Residential Copper Landline Replacement - Moratorium and Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Angel, Barron, Carr, Hill, C. Howard, Kelly, Kramer, McKay, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Robinson, Sanchez, Tarlau, M. Washington, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a telephone company that provides specified service from replacing specified copper landline service with optical fiber cable or Voice over Internet Protocol, subject to an exception; and requiring the Public Service Commission to report its findings and recommendations on specified matters to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Utilities - Residential Copper Landline Replacement - Moratorium and Study
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM