Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the House - Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a record relating to a formal complaint of job-related misconduct made against a law enforcement officer is not a personnel record under certain provisions of the Public Information Act under certain circumstances; authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of certain records involving a complaint of job-related misconduct made against a law enforcement officer; authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of certain records by a complainant only under certain circumstances; etc.:
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1029
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {432614/2 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {432614/2 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   4-101, 4-311, 4-351 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page