Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland School Discipline Reform Act
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Washington, Angel, Patterson, Tarlau, M. Washington, Wilkins, and Ali
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to adopt the Maryland Guidelines for a State Code of Discipline as the code of discipline for the local school system; requiring the State Department of Education to disaggregate data in any student discipline data report in a specified manner; requiring the Department to collect data on alternative school discipline practices; requiring the Department to implement standardized training practices on student discipline for all public school security personnel on or before July 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland School Discipline Reform Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland School Discipline Reform Act
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM