Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and Exceptions
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass and Hornberger
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of State funds to pay for an abortion procedure or health benefits coverage of abortion procedures; and providing that the prohibition does not apply if the pregnancy is the result of an act of rape or incest or the woman has a life-endangering condition arising from the pregnancy.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1357 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and Exceptions
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM