Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tuition Stabilization Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Brooks, Ciliberti, Clippinger, Gibson, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Jackson, Korman, Krimm, J. Lewis, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vogt, M. Washington, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the governing boards of public senior higher education institutions from approving increases in tuition that are more than 2% over the previous year's tuition for certain eligible students in certain academic years; providing that certain tuition restrictions apply to certain eligible students through a certain academic year, do not apply to eligible students after the fourth academic year, and do not apply to eligible students who attend the University of Maryland University College; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tuition Stabilization Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Tuition Stabilization Act of 2018
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM