Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Acevero, Charkoudian, Gilchrist, J. Lewis, Stewart, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System to determine whether to create an independent school board for the Juvenile Services Education System and identify ways to reform and improve juvenile education services; requiring the Workgroup to convene on or before September 1, 2019; requiring the Workgroup to submit a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly in a certain format by December 20, 2020; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0221
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1244 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text - First - Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page