Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration
Sponsored by
Delegate DeBoy
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a designated representative of a system institution of the University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, St. Mary's College of Maryland, or Baltimore City Community College, or the exclusive representative of sworn police officers employed by a system institution of the University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, St. Mary's College of Maryland, or Baltimore City Community College, to request that an arbitrator be employed under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0989
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM