Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Frush, and Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to adopt regulations requiring that classroom instruction for the driver education program include a video course of not more than 15 minutes that pertains to organ, eye, and tissue donation in the State and becoming an organ, eye, or tissue donor; and requiring the video course to be completed in the classroom.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0768 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM