Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in business as a liquid waste hauler in the State unless the vehicle used by the person to haul liquid waste is licensed annually by the Department of the Environment; establishing specified requirements for the application for and the issuance of a specified vehicle license; requiring the Department to set reasonable fees for the licensing and inspection of specified vehicles in a specified manner; requiring the Department to adopt specified regulations; providing for penalties; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0189 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-11A-01 through 9-11A-07 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM