Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Legal Mutual Liability Insurance Society of Maryland - Conservatorship and Transfer
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Barkley, Barnes, Haddaway-Riccio, Impallaria, Jameson, Love, McHale, W. Miller, Mitchell, Rudolph, and Schulz
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing for the assumption and exercise of specified powers of the Legal Mutual Liability Insurance Society of Maryland by the Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company (Minnesota Mutual) in a specified manner for specified purposes; appointing Minnesota Mutual as conservator of the Society for a specified period for specified purposes; providing powers to Minnesota Mutual for specified purposes; requiring Minnesota Mutual to provide specified public notice; authorizing transfer of specified assets and liabilities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0886
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014, January 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {657770/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Finance 41
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {657770/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 56
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-101, 24-101 through 24-110, 24-102, 24-104, 24-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM