Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Kelly, Afzali, Anderson, Clagett, Cullison, Elliott, Hogan, Hough, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Schulz, and V. Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations establishing specified calculation and reporting requirements for forensic laboratories; requiring the Department, for a specified purpose, to require that specified out-of-state forensic laboratories be accredited by a specified accreditation body; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0746
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-2A-01, 17-2A-02, 17-2A-03.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM