Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Apprenticeship Investment Act
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Barnes and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the amount from $1,000,000 to $3,000,000 of an appropriation that the Governor is required to provide in the annual budget for the Maryland Higher Education Commission for Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to create a statewide media campaign to promote participation in career and technical education and apprenticeships in workforce shortage occupations; requiring the Governor to provide at least $2,000,000 in fiscal year 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0517
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018, October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career Apprenticeship Investment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Appropriations and Economic Matters
Text - First - Career Apprenticeship Investment Act
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1905.2, 18-3303 )
(   10-742 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM