Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Career Centers for 21st-Century Jobs
Sponsored by
Delegates Qi, Acevero, Bagnall, Bartlett, Bhandari, Brooks, Carr, Dumais, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Hill, Hornberger, Jalisi, Kelly, Kipke, Korman, R. Lewis, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Saab, Shetty, Shoemaker, Smith, Stewart, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each local workforce development board to recruit employers to provide youth apprenticeships, registered apprenticeships, and job opportunities for certain students and graduates; requiring each local workforce development board to match high school students with youth apprenticeships, registered apprenticeships, and job opportunities; requiring the State and certain local governing bodies, beginning in fiscal year 2021, to distribute a certain amount of funding to local workforce development boards; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0558
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Career Centers for 21st-Century Jobs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Community Career Centers for 21st-Century Jobs
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-603, 11-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM