Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Cardin, Carr, Conway, DeBoy, Eckardt, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Ivey, A. Kelly, Kipke, Love, Malone, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Rudolph, Serafini, Szeliga, Vitale, A. Washington, and Wood
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1070
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {695965/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {695965/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 65
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM