Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Repeal - Transfer of Enrollees to Federal Health Insurance Marketplace
Sponsored by
Delegates Hough, Afzali, Aumann, Cluster, Eckardt, Frank, Glass, Hogan, Impallaria, Kach, Kipke, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, W. Miller, Otto, Parrott, Ready, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange; repealing the purpose, powers, duties, Board of Trustees, Executive Director and staff, functions and operations, funding, and administration of the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange; repealing the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Fund; repealing the Individual Exchange; repealing the SHOP Exchange; repealing the requirement that a portion of a specified tax be distributed to the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Fund for a specified purpose; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 12:30 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101.1, 19-214 )
(   14-502, 14-504, 15-1204.1, 15-1303, 15-141, 27-405, 31-101 through 31-119, 6-103.2, 8-301 )
(   2011, 2012, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM