Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure Act
Sponsored by
Delegate McMillan
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring corporations that receive at least $50,000 in specified State subsidies to file a specified disclosure report with the granting body that provides the subsidy; requiring the disclosure report to contain specified information; requiring the disclosure report to be provided on or before December 31 of each year; requiring a granting body to publish a compilation of the disclosure reports on its Web site on or before April 1 of each year; defining terms; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {766286/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {766286/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM