Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing System
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Pena-Melnyk, Clippinger, Guzzone, Braveboy, Carter, and Oaks
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish and maintain a specified electronic information sharing system and to adopt regulations to implement the system; establishing the Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment to study the feasibility and appropriateness of adopting a pretrial risk assessment tool for use by the judicial officers in an advisory capacity and other specified duties; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the General Assembly and Governor on or before December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0973
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014, October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {192511/3 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Cardin) {123729/1 Rejected (39-91)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-10)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {192511/3 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Cardin) {123729/1 Rejected (39-91) 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (123-10) 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM