Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Installation of Satellite Dish on Residential Rental Property
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a satellite dish from being installed on the roof or exterior walls of residential rental property at the request of a tenant unless the landlord has given permission in writing before the installation; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to develop a form for use to obtain the required permission and to make the form available on the Department's website; and establishing that a person installing a satellite dish on residential rental property is liable for any damage caused by the installation.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0608 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Installation of Satellite Dish on Residential Rental Property
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM