Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Assistance Program MC/PG 107-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to establish a Customer Assistance Program to provide financial assistance with water and sewer bills to eligible ratepayers on or before July 1, 2015; requiring the Commission to establish income eligibility standards for specified ratepayers to receive financial assistance under the Program; requiring specified income eligibility standards to be applied uniformly throughout the Washington Suburban Sanitary District; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0975 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {270017/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-3)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Favorable with Amendments {270017/1 Report Adopted 51
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/24/2015 3/22/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-3) 52
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Finance 49
Senate 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM