Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Eligibility and Annual Appropriation
Sponsored by
Delegate McIntosh
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain schools to remain eligible to participate in the Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program under certain circumstances; requiring the Governor to include an appropriation of $11,900,000 for the Program in the annual budget bill; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0818
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Eligibility and Annual Appropriation
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM