Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Entertainment Events and Ticketing Practices
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an entertainment event ticketing system to allow a purchaser to buy and transfer a ticket without additional fees or the consent of a certain person; requiring an entertainment event ticketing system to give a purchaser the option to remove any personal information from the purchaser's ticket; prohibiting a certain entertainment event or venue from denying a certain person admission to an event based on the fact that the ticket has been resold; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Entertainment Events and Ticketing Practices
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:26 PM
Click to return on the top page